Hitt v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Martha Hitt
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2022cv01465
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and hand delivered to plaintiff for service as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against the United States of America, filed by Martha Hitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's SF95)(Hodge, David)
November 28, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4217618 (B-2454). related document #1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Martha Hitt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AHI). (Hodge, David) Modified on 11/29/2022 (AHI).
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Martha Hitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitt v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hitt
Represented By: David J Hodge
Represented By: David J. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?