Williams v. Pelzer et al
Plaintiff: Donderrious Williams
Defendant: John Hamm, C. Simpson, Michael Jones, F. Allen, C. Allen, Christopher Cottles, Jeremy Pelzer, Demetrius Charley, William Streeter, Steven Parker, Luther Smith, John Ketteman, Thomas Hines and Deborah Toney
Case Number: 5:2024cv00706
Filed: May 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Any response to Ketteman's motion is due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Any reply is due within seven (7) days of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/26/2024. (LCB)
July 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Joinder (Partial) and Adoption of Motion to Dismiss by John Ketteman. (Jordan, Albert)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A McKnight, Jr on behalf of John Ketteman (McKnight, Thomas)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert L Jordan on behalf of John Ketteman (Jordan, Albert)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (LCB)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #92 the Redacted Motion for Leave to Appear PHV and DENIES as MOOT motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/24/2024. (LCB)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE UNDER SEAL by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR ALEXANDER BROOKS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, #2 Exhibit MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR JENNIFER ORTHWEIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Faraino, Lauren)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4639561 (B-12673). (Orthwein, Jennifer) Modified on 7/24/2024 (LCB).
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4626215. (Orthwein, Jennifer)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/1/2024. (Court Reporter None) (SHB)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: The Court SETS a Telephone Status Conference for July 1, 2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. Call-in information will be provided to parties separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/10/2024. (LCB)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: That the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than July 15, 2024; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after July 15, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/10/2024. (LCB)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:23-cv-00406. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that this case, and all pending motions, shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Northern Division, pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 5/22/2024. (BES) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (BES) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #84 Order to Show Cause, filed by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Response to Order re #84 Order to Show Cause, filed by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr.: Status Conference held on 4/29/2024 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Patricia Starkie, (334) 322-8053, patricia_starkie@almd.uscourts.gov.) (WW) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: It is ORDERED that on or before May 13, 2024, the parties shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, Northern Division. The parties shall file a reply to the opposing parties response on or before May 20, 2024. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 4/29/2024. (c/s) (LAB) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donderrious Williams re #81 Response to Order to Show Cause, #80 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant John Ketteman (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: it is ORDERED that a telephone status conference is SET in this matter for 4/29/2024, at 1:30 p.m. CT. The courtroom deputy will provide counsel with the call-in number. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to provide a court reporter for this proceeding. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 4/25/2024. (furn: Calendar, LW, WW)(HRR) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #79 Order to Show Cause, filed by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant John Ketteman by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that on or by 4/24/2024, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing (1) why he has not sought a default judgment against Ketteman and (2) why Ketteman should not be dismissed as a defendant in this case for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute, or (3) if service has not been properly perfected, why Ketteman should not be dismissed as a defendant for lack of timely service. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 4/18/2024. (HRR) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF re #77 Response in Opposition to Motion Reply Brief In Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Dismiss #66 Third Amended Complaint filed by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 4/2/2024 to clarify text (HRR). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit (doc. #74 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall file a response brief to the pending Motion to Dismiss (doc. #67 ) of not more than 50 pages, double-spaced, 14-point Times New Roman font; 2) The Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (doc. #75 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his response to the pending Motion to Dismiss (doc. #67 ) on or by March 28, 2024. Defendants may reply on or by April 11, 2024. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/21/2024. (CWL) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #67 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Doc. #66 ) by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to #67 Motion to Dismiss by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's response brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint (doc. #72 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Court's Standard Briefing Order (doc. #35 ).Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/20/2024. (HRR) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #73 ORDER - RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Doc. #66 ) filed by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 3/20/2024 to add stricken text (HRR). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: The Court construes the #69 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel as a Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel, and for good cause it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 3/1/2024. (no PDF attached) (HRR) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw and MOTION Substitute Counsel by Donderrious Williams as CONSTRUED in the Court's 71 TEXT ORDER. Disregard document number added to this filing, it was added in error (No PDF attached - see document #69 for PDF) (HRR) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Pursuant to the 71 Text Order - Attorney Alexander Brooks,Jennifer Orthwein for Donderrious Williams added. Attorney Felicia Medina terminated for said party. (no PDF attached) (HRR) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Donderrious Williams (Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 3/1/2024 to clarify text (HRR). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 68 BRIEF in Support re #67 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Doc. #66 ) filed by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) Modified on 2/27/2024 to add link(HRR). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Doc. #66 ) by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) Modified on 2/27/2024 to add link(HRR). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Amended Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, John Ketteman, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney, filed by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion (doc. #61 ) is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff shall file his proposed Third Amended Complaint (doc. #61 -1) on the public docket as the operative complaint on or by February 20, 2024. The pending motion to dismiss (doc. #59 ) is therefore DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 2/16/2024. (HRR) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #61 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER: Upon review of the Plaintiff's #61 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, it is ORDERED that on or by February 15, 2024, the Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE why the Motion should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 2/12/2024. (no pdf attached)(CWL) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Second Amended Complaint) (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 60 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #59 MOTION to Dismiss re #57 Second Amended Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT filed by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) Modified on 1/25/2024 to add link (CWL). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss re #57 Second Amended Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) Modified on 1/25/2024 to add link (CWL). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER: Upon review of the #57 Second Amended Complaint, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the Defendants' #52 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 1/11/2024. (no pdf attached) (CWL) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 (STRICKEN - ATTORNEY USED INCORRECT EVENT WHEN E-FILING) AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, John Ketteman, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney, filed by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 1/11/2024 (CWL). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ORDER: For good cause, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #55 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the second amended complaint on or by January 12, 2024. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 1/11/2024. (No pdf attached)(CWL) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Second Amended Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, John Ketteman, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney, filed by Donderrious Williams. (no pdf attached - see doc #57 for pdf; attorney used incorrect event when e-filing)(CWL) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 First Amended Complaint) (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. John Ketteman served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024. (Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 12/29/2023 to correct the dft name to reflect as John Ketteman (not Kettleman) (WCL). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER: Upon review of the #49 First Amended Complaint, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the Defendants' #30 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot with leave to refile. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 12/13/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Summons Issued as to John Ketteman. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cwl, ) Modified on 12/29/2023 to correct the dft name to reflect as John Ketteman (not Kettleman) (WCL). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (STRICKEN AS ERRONEOUS - ATTORNEY USED INCORRECT EVENT WHEN E-FILING) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory and Injuctive Relief with JURY DEMAND against C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney, John Kettleman, filed by Donderrious Williams.(Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 12/12/2023 to add jury demand and def names (cwl, ). Modified on 12/12/2023 (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2023: #1 Certificate of Service) (cwl, ). Modified on 12/29/2023 to correct the dft name to reflect as John Ketteman (not Kettleman) (WCL). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Amended Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, John Ketteman, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney, filed by Donderrious Williams. (no pdf attached - see doc #49 for pdf. attorney used incorrect event when e-filing)(cwl, ) Modified on 12/29/2023 to correct the dft name to reflect as John Ketteman (not Kettleman) (WCL). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion for Joseph Mitchell McGuire to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 12/11/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER granting #45 Motion for Susanne Emily Cordner to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 12/11/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Joseph Mitchell McGuire to Withdraw as Attorney by Donderrious Williams. (McGuire, Joseph) Modified on 12/11/2023 to add atty's name to text (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Susanne Emily Cordner to Withdraw as Attorney by Donderrious Williams. (Cordner, Susanne) Modified on 12/11/2023 to add atty's name to text (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: The Court construes the #43 Notice of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as a motion for leave to file an amended complaint. For good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before December 13, 2023. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 12/11/2023. (no pdf attached)(cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO 48 TEXT ORDER - Attorney Joseph Mitchell McGuire terminated. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO 47 TEXT ORDER - Attorney Susanne Emily Cordner terminated. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Donderrious Williams, as construed in the Court's 44 Text Order. (no pdf attached - see doc #43 for pdf) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order (STRICKEN AS ERRONEOUS) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages, Declaratory and Injuctive Relief with JURY DEMAND against C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney, John Kettleman, filed by Donderrious Williams. (No pdf attached - see doc #43 -1 for pdf)(cwl, ) Modified on 12/11/2023 (cwl, ).[Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elaena Faraino on behalf of Donderrious Williams (No pdf attached - see doc #42 for pdf. Attorney used incorrect event when e-filing) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of First Amended Complaint by Donderrious Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 12/11/2023 to clarify text (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (STRICKEN - Document is not a motion. Attorney used incorrect event when e-filing) MOTION for Leave to Appear by Donderrious Williams. (Faraino, Lauren) Modified on 12/11/2023 (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER: Upon review of #38 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' #30 Motion to Dismiss is EXTENDED from December 8, 2023, up to and including December 22, 2023. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 12/1/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: Upon review of #37 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Name of Defendant and for Corrected Summons, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before December 8, 2023, correcting the spelling of Defendant John Ketteman's name. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue a corrected summons after Plaintiff files an amended complaint, if any. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 12/1/2023. (no pdf attached)(cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Deadline to Respond re #30 MOTION to Dismiss by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Amend/Correct Name of Defendant and for Corrected Summons by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #32 ) is GRANTED in part. The deadline for the Plaintiff to perfect service on the remaining defendant pursuant to Rule 4(m) is EXTENDED up to and including December 22, 2023, as further set out in order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) Report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than December 1, 2023, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 11/22/2023. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: setting out briefing requirements, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 11/21/2023. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney re #33 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Deborah Toney, C. Simpson, C. Allen, Thomas Hines. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Deadline for Service of Summons by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Hunter Layne Sims,Cameron Wayne Elkins for C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney added. (NO PDF ATTACHED) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Thomas Hines served on 10/15/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. C. Allen served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Answer Deadline: Deborah Toney answer due 11/6/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Deborah Toney served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 10/24/2023 to add answer due date (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. C. Simpson waiver sent on 10/13/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: For good cause, it is ORDERED that the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #23 ) is GRANTED, and the time for the Defendants to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED up to and including November 17, 2023. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 10/12/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, Luther Smith, William Streeter. (Hetzel, Tara) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, Luther Smith, William Streeter. (Hetzel, Tara) Modified on 10/11/2023 to correct motion event (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ***PURSUANT TO THE #23 MOTION - Attorney Cameron Wayne Elkins for F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, Luther Smith, William Streeter added. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #21 ) is GRANTED, and the deadline for the Plaintiff to perfect service on the defendants pursuant to Rule 4(m) is EXTENDED up to and including November 17, 2023, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 9/29/2023. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Deadline for Service of Summons re #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint,,, by Donderrious Williams. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. William Streeter served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Luther Smith served on 9/27/2023, answer due 10/18/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Jeremy Pelzer served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Steven Parker served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Michael Jones served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. John Hamm served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. F. Allen served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Edward Ellington served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Chadwick Crabtree served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Christopher Cottles served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donderrious Williams. Demetrius Charley served on 9/22/2023, answer due 10/13/2023. (Brooks, Alexander) Modified on 9/28/2023 to correct date served & answer deadline (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadline: Answer for Demetrius Charley due 10/13/2023. (no pdf attached) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave for Alexander Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/11/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction re #6 MOTION for Leave for Alexander Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to attach a corrected PDF to correct the title of the motion. (Attachments: #1 Main PDF to Document #6 )(amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave for Felicia Medina to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/11/2023. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave for Alexander Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3465992.) by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cordner, Susanne) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/11/2023 to attach a corrected PDF to correct the title of the motion) (amf, ). Modified on 7/11/2023 (amf, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave for Felicia Medina to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number AALMDC-3465975.) by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cordner, Susanne) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C. Allen, F. Allen, Demetrius Charley, Christopher Cottles, Chadwick Crabtree, Edward Ellington, John Hamm, Thomas Hines, Michael Jones, Jason Kettleman, Steven Parker, Jeremy Pelzer, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, William Streeter, Deborah Toney.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (hrr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Assigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as Presiding Judge and Magistrate Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as Referral Judge. (hrr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donderrious Williams. (McGuire, Joseph) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jeremy Pelzer, Michael Jones, Steven Parker, Christopher Cottles, C. Simpson, Luther Smith, C. Allen, F. Allen, Thomas Hines, Jason Kettleman, Demetrius Charley, Deborah Toney, Chadwick Crabtree, William Streeter, Edward Ellington, John Hamm ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BALMDC-3461569.), filed by Donderrious Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(McGuire, Joseph) Modified on 6/30/2023 to clarify attachments 1 & 2 docket text (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2023 as attorney erroneously left off when e-filing case: #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (cwl, ). Modified on 6/30/2023 to reflect jury demand(hrr, ). (Main Document 1 and Attachment 2 replaced on 6/30/2023 to correct dft names) (hrr, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 5/31/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pelzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hamm
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Simpson
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jones
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Allen
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Allen
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cottles
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Pelzer
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrius Charley
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Streeter
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Parker
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Smith
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ketteman
Represented By: Thomas A McKnight, Jr
Represented By: Albert L Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hines
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Toney
Represented By: Tara Smelley Hetzel
Represented By: Hunter Sims
Represented By: Cameron Wayne Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donderrious Williams
Represented By: Lauren Faraino
Represented By: Jennifer Orthwein
Represented By: Alexander Brooks
Represented By: Alexander Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?