Yafai et al v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Daina Khaled Al-Awdi and Shaif Sameer Yafai
Defendant: Christopher Snipes, Rena Bitter, Andrea Tomaszewicz and Anthony J Blinken
Case Number: 5:2024cv01355
Filed: October 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Daina Khaled Al-Awdi, Shaif Sameer Yafai. filed by Daina Khaled Al-Awdi, Shaif Sameer Yafai (Fenny, Tamunotonte)
October 25, 2024 PHV Fee paid: $ 100, receipt number AALNDC-4709234 (B-14470). Paid on behalf of Tamunotonte Fenny. (Fenny, Tamunotonte) Modified on 10/28/2024 (AHI).
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court PROVISIONALLY GRANTS the #2 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Tamunotonte Fenny as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/21/2024. (AHI)
October 10, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiffs' attorney for service as to Rena Bitter, Anthony J Blinken, Christopher Snipes, Andrea Tomaszewicz, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
October 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daina Khaled Al-Awdi, Shaif Sameer Yafai. (Fenny, Tamunotonte)
October 8, 2024 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4697489 (B-14127). related document #1 COMPLAINT for Write in the Nature of Mandamus and Violation of the Administrative Procedure Act against All Defendants filed by Shaif Sameer Yafai and Daina Khaled Al-Awdi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AHI). (Fenny, Tamunotonte) Modified on 10/8/2024 (AHI).
October 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Write in the Nature of Mandamus and Violation of the Administrative Procedure Act against All Defendants filed by Shaif Sameer Yafai and Daina Khaled Al-Awdi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yafai et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Snipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rena Bitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Tomaszewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daina Khaled Al-Awdi
Represented By: Enefaa Saturday Fenny
Represented By: Tamunotonte Fenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaif Sameer Yafai
Represented By: Enefaa Saturday Fenny
Represented By: Tamunotonte Fenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?