Hager Oil Company Inc. v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Hager Oil Company Inc.
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv01234
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Jasper Office
County: Tuscaloosa
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/18/2019 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/19/2018. (PSM)
September 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Scheduling Conference held on 9/19/2018. (PSM)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ray, Michael)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in chambers, Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. At least one attorney for each party must attend the conference in person.(PSM)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Hager Oil Company Inc. (Brakefield, James)
August 7, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601091120. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BNSF Railway Company from Circuit Court of Walker County, case number 64-cv-2018-900260.00., filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(PSM). (Ray, Michael) Modified on 8/7/2018 (TLM, ).
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company. filed by BNSF Railway Company (Ray, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Defendant BNSF Railway Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company.(Ray, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/6/2018. (PSM)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BNSF Railway Company from Circuit Court of Walker County, case number 64-cv-2018-900260.00., filed by BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hager Oil Company Inc. v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Michael W Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hager Oil Company Inc.
Represented By: James C Brakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?