Dozier v. Foremost Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Andy Eugene Dozier
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv02015
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2019. Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2020 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/8/2019. (PSM)
January 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2019. (PSM)
December 26, 2018 NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 1:30 PM in chambers, Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. At least one attorney for each party must attend the conference in person.(PSM)
December 21, 2018 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bradford, Robert)
December 7, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number B4601093969. (Bradford, Robert) Modified on 12/10/2018 (TLM, ).
December 7, 2018 3 Foremost Insurance Company, Grand Rapids, Michigan ANSWER to Complaint by Foremost Insurance Company.(Bradford, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/6/2018. (PSM)
December 6, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foremost Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Walker County, case number 64-cv-2018-900433., filed by Foremost Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 EX A, #2 EX B)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dozier v. Foremost Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Eugene Dozier
Represented By: Daniel H Boman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert William Bradford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?