Cody v. Jasper Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Perry Lynn Cody
Defendant: Walker County Public Defenders, Jasper Municipal Court, Jasper Police Department and Walker County Courthouse
Case Number: 6:2019cv00745
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted applications to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Docs. #2 , #7 , #9 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/28/2019. (KEK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE - attached last page with signature re #1 Complaint re #8 Order, by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER As stated within, the undersigned WITHDRAWS the report and recommendation of dismissal entered on June 3, 2019, #6 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Order, a copy of the Order of May 17, 2019, #3 , and a copy of the complaint, #1 , on the plaintiff on the plaintiff at the Walker County Jail. The plaintiff MUST return a signed copy of his complaint within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/11/2019. (PSM)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of INFORMATION REGARDING PRISONER ACCOUNTS re #3 Order by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 **** WITHDRAWN **** MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the plaintiffs failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/3/2019. (PSM) Withdrawn per #8 on 6/11/2019 (PSM).
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Mail (order doc #3 ) Returned as Undeliverable; Return to Sender; OOF. Mail sent to Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Mail (notification of case filing) Returned as Undeliverable, Return to Sender, OOF. Mail sent to Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING The plaintiff's complaint and application to in forma pauperis are deficient for the reasons indicated within. The plaintiff must correct the deficient pleadings within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order, in the manner explained. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(PSM)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with attachment, against Jasper Municipal Court, Jasper Police Department, Walker County Courthouse, Walker County Public Defenders, filed by Perry Lynn Cody. (KWC) (NOTE: complaint not signed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cody v. Jasper Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker County Public Defenders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Municipal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Lynn Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?