Richards v. Noe et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Timothy J Richards
Defendant: Kay Ivey, Hoyt Elliott, Greg Reed, Jefferson S Dunn, Steven T Marshall, Guy Noe and Del Marsh
Case Number: 6:2019cv01096
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Jasper Office
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT by Timothy J Richards. (KEK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Apply the Relation-Back Doctrine by Timothy J Richards. (KEK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend the Petition by Timothy J Richards. (KEK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Partial Judgment by Timothy J Richards. (KEK)
August 26, 2019 Motion of defendants treating answer #12 as a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Order #13 . (KEK)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Respondents have filed an answer seeking dismissal of this habeas petition. (Doc. #11 ). The court deems the case ripe for summary disposition under Rule 8(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases on the basis of the defenses asserted in Respondents answer. Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/26/2019. (KEK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Respondents' ANSWER to Complaint by Steven T Marshall, Guy Noe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Nunnelley, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition by Timothy J Richards. (KEK)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Nunnelley on behalf of Guy Noe (Nunnelley, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED Respondents appear and show cause in writing within forty-two (42) days from the date of this Order, why the relief Petitioner requests should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/15/2019. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00428. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 15, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (cnw, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) The #6 objections are overruled; 2) The magistrate judge's #5 recommendation is adopted; 3) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 USC 1631; DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/15/2019. (cnw, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendation filed by Timothy J. Richards. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of AL under 28 USC 1631; Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/21/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/21/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the instant petition for habeas corpus relief be construed as one filed under 28 USC 2254 and henceforth proceed as such a petition; DIRECTING the Clerk to undertake such action which is necessary to identify this petition as a 28 USC 2254 petition. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/21/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Timothy J. Richards. (arc, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Timothy J. Richards. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(arc, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Noe et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyt Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T Marshall
Represented By: Michael Anthony Nunnelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Noe
Represented By: Michael Anthony Nunnelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?