T.R. v. Lamar County Board of Education, The et al

Plaintiff: T.R.
Defendant: Lamar County Board of Education, The, Kathy Dean, Vance Harron and Lisa Stamps
Case Number: 6:2019cv01101
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.R., Lisa Stamps served but date of delivery omitted. (Bailey, Matthew) Modified on 9/3/2019 (JLC).
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T.R.. Kathy Dean served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Bailey, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kathy Dean, Vance Harron, Lisa Stamps. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
August 1, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601099479. (JLC)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficient Pleading - The Plaintiffs complaint is deficient for the following reason. The Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee of $350 and administrative fee of $50. The Plaintiff must pay a total of $400 to the Clerk of the Court ($350 filing fee + $50 administrative fee) to the Clerk of the Court within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If the Plaintiff fails to do so, the Court will dismiss this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/31/2019. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathy Dean, Vance Harron, Lamar County Board of Education, The, Lisa Stamps, filed by T.R..(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.R. v. Lamar County Board of Education, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar County Board of Education, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Harron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.R.
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Bailey
Represented By: Leroy Maxwell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?