Murray v. Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE) et al
Plaintiff: Lois Murray
Defendant: Brad Ingle, Dr. Vonda Beaty, Lee Ann Headrick, Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE), Todd Vick, Dr. Joel Hagood and Trent Kennedy
Case Number: 6:2019cv01103
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2020. Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/10/2019. (PSM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carr, Clay)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vonda Beaty, Joel Hagood, Lee Ann Headrick, Brad Ingle, Trent Kennedy, Todd Vick, Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE). (Carr, Clay)
August 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 8/26/2019. (PSM)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lois Murray. (McGowan, Candis)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE of RESETTING Hearing: Telephone Conference RESET for 8/26/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call 877-336-1828 and use Access code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/9/2019. (PSM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Vonda Beaty, Joel Hagood, Lee Ann Headrick, Brad Ingle, Trent Kennedy, Todd Vick, Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE). (Boardman, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lois Murray. Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE) served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (KAM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed (certified mail). Vonda Beaty served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Joel Hagood served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Lee Ann Headrick served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Brad Ingle served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Todd Vick served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (KWC)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE). Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lois Murray. (McGowan, Candis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted (Vacant) by Lois Murray as to Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE). (KEK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lois Murray. Trent Kennedy served but date of delivery omitted. (JLC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Vonda Beaty, Joel Hagood, Lee Ann Headrick, Brad Ingle, Trent Kennedy, Todd Vick, Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE). Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 17, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601099175. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lois Murray. (PSM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vonda Beaty, Joel Hagood, Lee Ann Headrick, Brad Ingle, Todd Vick, Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE), filed by Lois Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Ingle
Represented By: Russell B Robertson
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Vonda Beaty
Represented By: Russell B Robertson
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Ann Headrick
Represented By: Russell B Robertson
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker County Board of Education (WCBOE)
Represented By: Russell B Robertson
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Vick
Represented By: Russell B Robertson
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joel Hagood
Represented By: Russell B Robertson
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Kennedy
Represented By: Russell B Robertson
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Murray
Represented By: Lacey K Danley
Represented By: Candis A McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?