Harrison v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Linda Darlene Harrison
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2019cv01353
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (AHI)
September 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3431259 (B4601100531). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Linda Darlene Harrison.(AHI ). (Bryan, Robert)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (AHI)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Linda Darlene Harrison.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Darlene Harrison
Represented By: Robert O Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?