C. et al v. Burgess et al
Plaintiff: H. C. and Mary Cochran
Defendant: Jim Burkhalter, Kim Smith, Kayla Burgess, Jeremy Madden, Kim Higginbotham and Fayette County Board of Education
Case Number: 6:2020cv00950
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 26 Brief re #25 MOTION to Dismiss . (Watkins, Katherine)
September 3, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Jim Burkhalter, Kim Higginbotham, Jeremy Madden. (Watkins, Katherine)
September 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Brooks, Taylor)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/28/2020. (MEB2)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - because the court has original jurisdiction over the federal claim and supplemental jurisdiction over the state-law claims, it is ORDERED that the motion to remand #12 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/25/2020. (KAM)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER - GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on August 21, 2020. (ASL)
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court By Plaintiffs filed by Kayla Burgess, Jim Burkhalter, Fayette County Board of Education, Kim Higginbotham, Jeremy Madden, Kim Smith. (Yuengert, Anne)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER - the Telephone Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/11/2020. (KAM)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden filed by Kayla Burgess, Jim Burkhalter, H. C., Mary Cochran, Fayette County Board of Education, Kim Higginbotham, Jeremy Madden, Kim Smith (KAM)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 11:00 AM on Wednesday, August 12, 2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be canceled (ASL)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a District Judge after 8/20/2020 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; telephone status conference is SET for 11:00 on August 12, 2020. The parties are DIRECTED to dial 866-390-1828 no less than five minutes before the status conference begins. The access code is 9262283; the telephone conference will be cancelled if all parties submit forms 24 hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/24/2020. (KAM)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is GRANTED. All responsive pleadings should be filed on or before September 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 07/24/2020. (SUH)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, #12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court By Plaintiffs OPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Jim Burkhalter, Kim Higginbotham, Jeremy Madden. (Watkins, Katherine)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendants are ORDERED to respond to the motion on or before August 14, 2020. Any reply by Plaintiffs should be filed on or before August 21, 2020. The motion will be deemed under submission on August 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 07/24/2020. (SUH)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court By Plaintiffs by H. C., Mary Cochran. (Sears, Shane)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The #10 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED. Defendants are ORDERED to file their responsive pleadings on or before 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/13/2020. (KMAW)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Kim Smith. (Brooks, Taylor)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine H Watkins on behalf of Jim Burkhalter, Kim Higginbotham, Jeremy Madden (Watkins, Katherine)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S Boardman on behalf of Jim Burkhalter, Kim Higginbotham, Jeremy Madden (Boardman, Mark)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant Kayla Burgess is ORDERED to file her responsive pleading on or before 7/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/10/2020. (KMAW)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for Enlargement of Time by Kayla Burgess. (Marsh, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kayla Burgess. filed by Kayla Burgess (Marsh, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Warren Marsh on behalf of Kayla Burgess (Marsh, John)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor P Brooks on behalf of Kim Smith (Brooks, Taylor)
July 7, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3624418. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jim Burkhalter, Kayla Burgess, Kim Higginbotham, Fayette County Board of Education, Kim Smith, Jeremy Madden from Fayette County Circuit Court, case number 2020-900032., filed by Jim Burkhalter, Kayla Burgess, Kim Higginbotham, Fayette County Board of Education, Kim Smith, Jeremy Madden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(KAM). (Yuengert, Anne)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL (KAM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jim Burkhalter, Kayla Burgess, Kim Higginbotham, Fayette County Board of Education, Kim Smith, Jeremy Madden from Fayette County Circuit Court, case number 2020-900032., filed by Jim Burkhalter, Kayla Burgess, Kim Higginbotham, Fayette County Board of Education, Kim Smith, Jeremy Madden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. et al v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Burkhalter
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Represented By: Katherine H Watkins
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Smith
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Represented By: Taylor P Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Burgess
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Represented By: John Warren Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Madden
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Represented By: Katherine H Watkins
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Higginbotham
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Represented By: Katherine H Watkins
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayette County Board of Education
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Represented By: Anne R Yuengert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. C.
Represented By: Shane T Sears
Represented By: Andrew Seth Ladores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cochran
Represented By: Shane T Sears
Represented By: Andrew Seth Ladores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?