Wallace et al v. Jennmar et al
Plaintiff: Larry G Wallace and Lori Wallace
Defendant: Jennmar and James Balcar
Case Number: 6:2020cv02083
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Brooke Massey on behalf of Larry G Wallace, Lori Wallace (Massey, Kimberly)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/8/2021. (PSM)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bolvig, C)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/4/2021. (PSM)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennmar. filed by Jennmar (Bolvig, C)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jennmar from Circuit Court of Walker County, Alabama, case number 64-cv-2020-900103, filed by Jennmar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State complaint filed 4/1/20, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(KEK)
December 29, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jennmar. *See Doc #1 , Exhibit B, pages 3-8* (KEK)
December 29, 2020 Defendant James Balcar was dismissed as a party on 12/8/2020. See Doc #1 , Exhibit B, pages 119-120. (KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace et al v. Jennmar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G Wallace
Represented By: Honora McKeown Gathings
Represented By: Lloyd W Gathings, II
Represented By: Reynolds Parker Pittman
Represented By: Kimberly Brooke Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Wallace
Represented By: Honora McKeown Gathings
Represented By: Lloyd W Gathings, II
Represented By: Reynolds Parker Pittman
Represented By: Kimberly Brooke Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennmar
Represented By: C Peter Bolvig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Balcar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?