Bailey v. Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc.
Plaintiff: Jared Bailey
Defendant: Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv01277
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 11/10/21. (JWG)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Filing Deadlines by Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc.. (Hancock, William)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William K Hancock on behalf of Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc. (Hancock, William)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Bailey. Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc. served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Porter, Adam)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
September 24, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3931731 (B4601115973). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc., filed by Jared Bailey.(PSM). (Porter, Adam) Modified on 9/27/2021 (MRR, ).
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc., filed by Jared Bailey.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Bailey
Represented By: Adam M Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins-Burke Funeral Home Inc.
Represented By: William K Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?