Wright v. Wilks et al
Plaintiff: Jill Davis Wright
Defendant: Freddie Wilks and Royal Furniture Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv01333
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/30/2021. (KAM)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to Judge R. David Proctor; Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Freddie Wilks.(Zulanas, Christopher)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Davis Wright. Freddie Wilks served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Gorham, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Jill Davis Wright by Royal Furniture Company.(Zulanas, Christopher)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE; You must complete the attached form to indicate whether you consent to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge or decline to proceed before the assigned magistrate judge. (DNW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Royal Furniture Company, and Freddie Wilks.(Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Freddie E. Wilks). Returned to Plaintiff for service. (DNW, )
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Furniture Company and Freddie Wilks,filed by Jill Davis Wright. Filing Fee $402.00 (B4601116191)(DNW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Wilks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Davis Wright
Represented By: Robert L. Gorham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Wilks
Represented By: Christopher J Zulanas
Represented By: Jess S Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Furniture Company
Represented By: Christopher J Zulanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?