Culverson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Theresa Culverson
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2022cv01207
Filed: September 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Choi on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Choi, Sarah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B Hood on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Hood, Jack)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, returned for service (LMW)
September 28, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number B-1355 (LMW)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The court DENIES the motion to proceed in forma pauperis WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ms. Culverson must pay the $402 filing fee to the court on or before September 27, 2022. If she does not do so, the court will dismiss the action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/20/2022. (LMW)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The court VACATES order #4 to correct a scrivener's error. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/20/2022. (LMW)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The court DENIES the motion to proceed in forma pauperis WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ms. Culverson must pay the $400 filing fee to the court on or before September 27, 2022. If she does not do so, the court will dismiss the action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/20/2022. (LMW)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE: Counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days from the entry date of this notice. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (LMW)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Theresa Culverson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(LMW)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Theresa Culverson.(LMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culverson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Culverson
Represented By: Robert O Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?