Parker v. The CBE Group Inc
Plaintiff: Nia Parker
Defendant: The CBE Group Inc
Case Number: 6:2022cv01502
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nia Parker (Philipps, David)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The Plaintiff has reported to the Court that a settlement has been reached in this matter (D0c. #8 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any party may, for good cause shown, reopen this action within thirty days from the date of this Order. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 12/30/2022. (MEB2)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nia Parker (Notice of Settlement) (Philipps, David)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed The CBE Group Inc served on 12/14/2022, Answer due 1/4/2023. (CTF)
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The CBE Group Inc via certified U. S. Mail on this the 12th day of December, 2022. (CTF)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Nia Parker (Sykstus, Ronald)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/30/2022. (MEB2)
November 29, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4219369 (B2526). related document #1 COMPLAINT against The CBE Group Inc, filed by Nia Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (MEB2). (Philipps, David) Modified on 11/30/2022 (MEB2).
November 29, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4219372 (B2524). (Philipps, David) Modified on 11/30/2022 (MEB2).
November 29, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4219373 (B2525). (Philipps, David) Modified on 11/30/2022 (MEB2).
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps by Nia Parker. (MEB2)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Nia Parker. (MEB2)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The CBE Group Inc, filed by Nia Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. The CBE Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nia Parker
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CBE Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?