Hackman v. Walker County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Jamikel Hackman
Defendant: Walker County Jail, Sheriff Smith, Administrator White and Capt Tidwell
Case Number: 6:2023cv00945
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Jamikel Hackman (RMM)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The plaintiff has filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a certified copy of his jail or prison account statements. Doc. 5. It is ORDERED that the application is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/17/2023. (DNW)
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamikel Hackman. (DNW)
August 15, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamikel Hackman.(DNW).
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The plaintiff must correct this deficiency within 14 days. If he does not correct the deficiency by this deadline, the court may dismiss this action for want of prosecution without further notice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 7/25/2023. (DNW) Modified on 7/25/2023 (DNW).
July 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE to plaintiff. (DNW)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administrator White, Capt Tidwell, Sheriff Smith, Walker County Jail filed by Jamikel Hackman.(DNW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackman v. Walker County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamikel Hackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?