Poe v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Poe
Defendant: Sheriff Smith, Administrator White and Capt Tidwell
Case Number: 6:2023cv00948
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned RECOMMENDS the Court DISMISS this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE The plaintiff must file any objections with the Clerk of Court within 14 calendar days from the date this report and recommendation is enter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/11/2023. (LCB)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is to comply with the 7/28/2023 order within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Failure to comply by the deadline may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/18/2023. (AHI)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Plaintiff is to notify the court within 14 days from the entry date of this order whether he wants to continue with this 1983 action and correct the deficiencies; or dismiss this 1983 action and file a separate habeas action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/28/2023. (AHI)
July 24, 2023 Filing 2 PRISONER Case Number Notice (AHI)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nicholas Poe.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?