Spears v. State of Alabama et al
Petitioner: Darrell J Spears
Respondent: State of Alabama and Administrator White
Case Number: 6:2023cv00949
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Darrell J Spears.(AKD)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER-Because Plaintiff Spear's pleadings are deficient, Spears is ORDERED to re-file his pleadings, in accordance with the following instructions, within 30 days of the date of this order. Spears is ORDERED to EITHER file an amended petition for habeas relief pursuant to 2241 OR file an 1983 complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve on Spears (1) a copy of this order, (2) twocopies of the form 2241 habeas petition form, (3) two copies of the form Complaint For Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner Complaint), and (4) two applications to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 08/03/2023. (AKD)
July 24, 2023 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re Case Number (AKD)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Darrell J Spears.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell J Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Administrator White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?