Frazer v. Johnson Controls Inc et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Frazer
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc, ANM Services LLC, Ediasa, Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc doing business as AZ Quality and William Yee
Case Number: 7:2011cv03956
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Western Office
County: Tuscaloosa
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING CASE For reasons noted within, the court DISMISSES this action with prejudice as to Defendant Genots AZ Quality Services Inc. and DISMISSES without prejudice as to William Yee, each party to bear her, his, or its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/5/14. (SAC )
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before June 18, 2014, why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) for failure to prosecute, as to Defendant William Yee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/4/2014. (MSN)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS ANM Services LLC and Johnson Controls Inc. The court hereby GRANTS #80 , and dismisses defendants ANM Services, LLC and Johnson Controls, Inc. w/prejudice. Costs taxed as paid. The case shall proceed against defendants Genot's AZ Quality Services, Inc. d/b/a AZ Quality and William Yee. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Karon Owen Bowdre on 6/3/2014. (FNC)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #64 Motion to Dismiss. Genot's is ORDERED to respond to Frazer's amended complaint by 5/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/25/2014. (AVC)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc answer due 5/9/2014. (AVC)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER that if a party desires to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, the attached consent form should be signed and MAILED to clerk w/i 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/24/14. (ASL)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER, as set out, pursuant to #73 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dft Ediasa, and Pla Courtney Frazer responding to the motion stating no opposition. Accordingly, all claims agains Dft Ediasa are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The case remains pending against the other dfts. Dft Ediasa terminated. Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 3/14/14. (CTS, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/3/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/1/2014 along w/ other time limits & conditions w/ Appendix I attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 2/12/14. (CTS, )
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, L)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response to EDIASA's Motion to Dismiss filed by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER setting motion deadline as to #73 Motion to Dismiss. Any opposition to the motion should be filed by January 14, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/31/13. (MEF)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss by Ediasa. (Feigel, Leonard)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER adopting and accepting #56 Report and Recommendations. denying #42 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/29/2013. (KAM, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part the R&R; denying #37 Motion to Dismiss; ; denying #11 Motion to Dismiss; the time for perfecting service on dft Ediasa is extended 60 days from this date. Signed by Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/29/2013. (KAM, )
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John H England, III. Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. (KAM, )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 6/4/13. (JTR)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Bar Admissions, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Walter)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-1935290. (Kelley, Walter) Modified on 6/3/2013 to reflect USDC Receipt #B4601044181 (CTS, ).
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. (Kelley, Walter)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to File -- the document shall be filed within 11 days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 5/9/13. (JTR)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Genot's AZ Quality Services, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) and 12(b)(5))(Kelley, Walter)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Courtney Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, L)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER setting motion deadline #64 Motion to Dismiss -- any opposition to the motion should be filed within 11 days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 4/16/13. (JTR)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Brief re #64 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kelley, Walter)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss by Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. (Kelley, Walter)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint by ANM Services LLC.(Singley, Scott)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 4/1/13. (JTR)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. (Kelley, Walter)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Frazer. Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc served on 3/11/2013, answer due 4/1/2013. (Goldfarb, Jon)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ALIAS Summons Issued as to ANM Services LLC at 4508 Cross Creek Dr, Ann Arbor, MI address. DEL to pla's counsel for service. (CTS, )
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ALIAS Summons Issued as to ANM Services LLC, & Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. DEL to pla's counsel for service. (CTS, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing:A conference is set on Wednesday, February 27, 2013 at 8:00 am, central standard time, before Chief Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn. The court plans to discuss the pending motions to dismiss for improper service, along with the magistrate judge's R&Rs as to both Ediasa and ANM Services, even though the latter did not file objections. This conference will be conducted via a telephone call initiated by the court. The parties should contact the chambers of the undersigned at (205) 278-1810 to advise the names and contact numbers of the participants. (SMH)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Based on Improper Service filed by Ediasa, #37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Service filed by Ediasa, #42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANM Services LLC -- the clerk of court is ORDERED to REFER the motions to a district judge for disposition. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 2/4/13. (JTR)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to re #57 Ediasa's Objections to R & R filed by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Opposition to re #55 Ediasa's Objections to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation denying Ediasa's Motion to Dismiss filed by Ediasa. (Feigel, Leonard)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, as set out, re #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Service. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2013. Specific written objections to this R&R may be filed w/in 14 days fm the date it is filed in the office of the Clerk. If objections are filed, the opposing party has 10 additional days to file a response. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 12/20/12. (CTS, )
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, as set out, pursuant to the filing of two motions to dismiss for improper service re #11 and #37 . Any party may file specific written objections to this R&R w/in 14 days fm the date it is filed in the office of the Clerk. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2013. If ofjections are filed, the opposing party has 10 additional days to file a response to the objections. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 12/20/12. (CTS, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #49 Motion to Strike -- Attorney Scott Singley has informed the court that the motion should be mooted. Singley's motion also asks that ANM's time to file an answer be stayed until after the court has issued a ruling on ANM's previously filed motion to dismiss. The request is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 11/20/12. (JTR)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Defendant's ANSWER to #46 Amended Complaint by Johnson Controls Inc.(Feigel, Leonard) Modified on 11/13/2012 to reflect Jury Demand (CTS, ).
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this court hereby rejects JCI's objections, and accepts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED, and JCI's motion to dismiss her claims is DENIED; It is ORDERED that the clerk of the court return this case to the Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/29/2012. (AHI)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Opposition to re #50 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation filed by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Courtney Frazer, #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Johnson Controls Inc -- these motions are REFERRED for disposition to C. Lynwood Smith, Jr., United States District Judge, who has been randomly selected by the clerk of court. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 4/18/12. (JTR)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS, as set out: #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Courtney Frazer, and #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Johnson Controls Inc. The time for objections to the recommendation #45 has expired, & the dft has filed an objection #50 . The clerk of court is DIRECTED to REFER this motion to a district judge for disposition. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 4/17/12. (CTS, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OBJECTION to #45 Report and Recommendations by Johnson Controls Inc. (Ware, Dabney)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Strike #46 Amended Complaint Or In The Alternative Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by ANM Services LLC. (Singley, Scott)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Brief re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Memorandum Reply Brief In Support) filed by ANM Services LLC. (Singley, Scott)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to File -- the brief should be filed into the record as a separate document. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 4/6/12. (JTR)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of ANM Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by ANM Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant ANM Services, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss)(Singley, Scott)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Courtney Frazer.(Smith, L)[ Modified on 4/2/2012 to reflect Jury Demand (CTS, ).]
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Courtney Frazer be granted and that the #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Johnson Controls Inc be denied as to all claims; Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2012; Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 3/29/2012. (BST)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Courtney Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, L)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER setting motion deadline #42 Motion to Dismiss -- any opposition to the motion should be filed within 11 days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 3/14/12. (JTR)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Brief re #42 MOTION to Dismiss. (Singley, Scott)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss by ANM Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Derrick N. Dabbs)(Singley, Scott)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Courtney Frazer as to Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. (Goldfarb, Jon)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Frazer. ANM Services LLC served on 2/17/2012, answer due 3/9/2012. (Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 2/28/2012 (CTS, ).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ALIAS Summons Reissued as to ANM Services, LLC, c/o Joseph Varner, Jackson, MS; DEL to pla's counsel for service. (CTS, )
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Service filed by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER setting motion deadline #37 Motion to Dismiss -- any opposition to the motion should be filed within 11 days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 2/3/12. (JTR)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Improper Service by Ediasa. (Hargrove, John)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ALIAS Summons Issued as to ANM Services LLC, c/o Any Officer..., Trussville, AL. Del to Pla's atty for service (CTS, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ALIAS Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ANM Services LLC, c/o Any Ofcr..., Flowood, MS (CTS, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ALIAS Summons Reissued as to AZ Quality Services Inc., c/o Any Ofcr, Managing or Gen Agt, Mesa, AZ; del to Pla's atty for service. (CTS, )
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ALIAS Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. c/o Any Officer, Mesa, AZ. Envelope marked "REFUSED", Return To Sender. (CTS, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Johnson Controls Inc. (Hargrove, John)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ediasa c/o Johnson Controls Inc., Montgomery, AL, served on 1/12/2012, answer due 2/2/2012. (CTS, )
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ALIAS Summons Reissued as to Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc., c/o Any Officer, managing or Gen Agent; sent by cert mail (CTS, )
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ALIAS Summons Reissued as to ANM Services LLC c/o Any Officer, Managing or Gen Agent, Flowood, MS; sent by cert mail. (CTS, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ANM Services LLC, c/o Bryan Morgan, Bham, AL. (CTS, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ediasa, c/o William Yee, El Paso, TX, served on 1/13/2012, answer due 2/3/2012. (CTS, )
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request for service by certified mail filed by Courtney Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons AZ Quality, #2 Exhibit Summons ANM)(Smith, L)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order PHV Fees paid for attys Dabney D Ware & Leonard V Feigel: $100.00, receipt number B4601030001 (CTS, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Ediasa (c/o Johnson Controls, Inc., c/o CT Corp Sys)- sent by cert mail (CTS, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Based on Improper Service filed by Courtney Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smith, L)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Request for service by certified mail filed by Courtney Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alias Summons)(Smith, L)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -- Northern District of Alabama Local Rule 83.1(b) provides: Any attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court but who is admitted to practice before the United States District Court for the district in which (or before the highest court in the state in which) such person resides or regularly practices law, may, upon request and payment of the prescribed fee (unless payment is waived by special order of the court), be allowed to appear in a case pro hac vice by an order of any district judge or bankruptcy judge of this court.... An attorney permitted to appear under this subsection is deemed to have conferred disciplinary jurisdiction upon this court for any alleged misconduct arising in the course of, or in preparation for, proceedings in the case; and for purposes of subsection (h) of this Rule the attorney shall be treated as if a member of the bar of this court with respect to acts and conduct in connection with such case. The applicants having complied with the requirements of the rule, are ADMITTED Pro Hac Vice upon payment of the appropriate fee. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 1/10/12. (JTR)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER setting motion deadline #20 Motion for Leave to File -- any opposition to the motion should be filed within 11 days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 1/10/12. (JTR)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Courtney Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, L)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave for Attorneys Dabney D Ware and Leonard V Feigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ediasa, Johnson Controls Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hargrove, John) Modified on 1/9/2012 (CTS, ).
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Ediasa. Sent by cert mail. (CTS, )
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Request for service by certified mail filed by Courtney Frazer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alias Summons)(Smith, L)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ALIAS Summons Issued as to ANM Services LLC. Sent by cert mail. (CTS, )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Request for service by certified mail upon dft ANM Services filed by Courtney Frazer. (CTS, )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 12/28/11. (JTR)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 12/19/11. (JTR)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Brief re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Based on Improper Service filed by Ediasa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hargrove, John)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Based on Improper Service by Ediasa. (Hargrove, John)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint until January 10, 2012 by Courtney Frazer. (Smith, L)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER setting motion deadline #11 Motion to Dismiss -- any opposition to the motion should be filed within 11 days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 12/19/11. (JTR)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER setting motion deadline #8 Motion to Dismiss -- any opposition to the motion should be filed within 11 days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Robert R Armstrong on 12/14/11. (JTR)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Brief re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Johnson Controls Inc. (Hargrove, John)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Johnson Controls Inc. (Hargrove, John)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to ANM Services LLC - Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward (CTS, )
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ediasa served on 11/26/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. (CTS, )
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Johnson Controls Inc served on 11/22/2011, answer due 12/13/2011. (CTS, )
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc. (NO MAIL RECEPTACLE) (CTS, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Sent by certified mail. (CTS, )
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Courtney Frazer. (CTS, )
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants w/ Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350.00, Receipt # B4601028578), filed by Courtney Frazer.(CTS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazer v. Johnson Controls Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Frazer
Represented By: Daniel E Arciniegas
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: L William Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Inc
Represented By: Dabney D Ware
Represented By: John W Hargrove
Represented By: Leonard V Feigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANM Services LLC
Represented By: Scott F Singley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ediasa
Represented By: Dabney D Ware
Represented By: John W Hargrove
Represented By: Leonard V Feigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genot's AZ Quality Services Inc doing business as AZ Quality
Represented By: James Burr Shields, II
Represented By: Walter A Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?