Union Insurance Company v. Blakeney Palmer Co LLC

Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company
Defendant: Blakeney Palmer Co LLC
Case Number: 7:2012cv04072
Filed: December 10, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/16/2015. (AVC)
January 15, 2015 107 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/15/2015. (AVC)
December 12, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/12/2014. (AVC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Insurance Company v. Blakeney Palmer Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Tanya E Dugas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blakeney Palmer Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?