Anthony v. Gordy et al
Petitioner: Vertis Anthony
Respondent: Christopher Gordy and Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Case Number: 7:2016cv00649
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Western Office
County: Bibb
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION ADOPTING and ACCEPTING the 75 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Also pending are Plaintiff's motions seeking (1) to reinstate his first amended complaint (doc. 77); (2) to subpoena an inmate as a witness (doc. 78); (3) an order directing the defendants to undergo a mental evaluation (doc. 79); and (4) production of video surveillance showing his refusal of medical treatment (doc.80). Upon due consideration, the motions are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/18/2019. (JLC)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's 37 Objections and ADOPTING and ACCEPTING the 34 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. To the extent Plaintiff's 38 MOTION seeks to Amend his Second Amended Complaint against the remaining de fendants in their individual capacities to request twenty million dollars in monetary damages, the Motion is GRANTED, ORDER DENYING 39 MOTION for Bail/Bond. The Court ORDERS that all claims in this matter, except the Plaintiff's due process and conditions of confinement claims against Warden Gordy and his medical claims against Nurse McKay, Warden Gordy, and Warden Thomas are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1). The Court further ORDERS the remaining claims are REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/12/2018. (JLC)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER After The court ADOPTS the report of the magistrate judge as modified within and ACCEPTS her recommendations. Petitioner's objections are OVERRULED. Petitioner's habeas claims are DISMISSED. Specifically, Petiti oner's § 2254 claims are DISMISSED as time-barred and unexhausted and Petitioner's § 2241 claims are (1) DENIED as MOOT to the extent they concern Petitioner's prolonged confinement in segregation;and (2) DENIED to the extent they concern ADOC's application of the "R" designation to Petitioner. The motion for release on bail pending habeas review is DENIED as MOOT. This matter is RECHARACTERIZED as invoking 42 U.S.C. § 1983. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the docket sheet to reflect this recharacterization. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/28/17. (SAC ) *Memo Op & Order placed in first class mail to pro se Plaintiff.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony v. Gordy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vertis Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Gordy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?