Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company v. Komatsu America Corp et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company
Defendant: Tractor & Equipment Company, Komatsu America Corp and Komatsu American Warranty Corp
Case Number: 7:2018cv01590
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company's motion to remand. #7 Defendant Komatsu America Corp. has informed the Court that it has no objection to Plaintiffs motion. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion to remand #7 is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Bibb County.Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/18/2018. (PSM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company. filed by Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company (Donald, William)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company. (Donald, William)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. (PSM)
October 4, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_numberB4601092528. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Komatsu America Corp from Circuit Court of Bibb County, case number 07-cv-2018-90067., filed by Komatsu America Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(PSM). (Strubel, J) Modified on 10/5/2018 (TLM, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Jicka by Komatsu America Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Strubel, J)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline K. Ivanov by Komatsu America Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Strubel, J)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Komatsu America Corp. filed by Komatsu America Corp (Strubel, J)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/27/2018. (PSM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Komatsu America Corp.(Strubel, J)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Komatsu America Corp from Circuit Court of Bibb County, case number 07-cv-2018-90067., filed by Komatsu America Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company v. Komatsu America Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor & Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komatsu America Corp
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komatsu American Warranty Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: William J Donald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?