Smith v. Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C. et al

Plaintiff: Dennis R Smith
Defendant: Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC and Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00048
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in chambers, Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. At least one attorney for each party must attend the conference in person.(PSM)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER This Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiff's Voluntary Notice of Dismissal of Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa, P.C. Without Prejudice #13 filed on February 22, 2019. Accordingly, Defendant Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa, P.C. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Affordable Dentures Laboratories, LLC remain pending. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/28/2019. (PSM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Maddalena, Yvonne)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dennis R Smith (Ritchey, Gregory)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC.(Maddalena, Yvonne)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Moreover, the Court expects to receive the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by no later than Friday, February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 2/15/2019. (TLM2)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.. (Maddalena, Yvonne)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The Court has before it Marcel L. Debruge, Meghan N. Cox, and Ronald D. Scott Williams's motion to withdraw as counsel. #8 . The motion is hereby GRANTED. Debruge, Cox, and Williams are to be TERMINATED as attorneys of record for Defendants. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/8/2019. (PSM)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw As Counsel of Record by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.. (Debruge, Marcel)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 2/1/2019. (TLM2)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.. (Maddalena, Yvonne)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 1/14/2019. (TLM2)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.. (Maddalena, Yvonne)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Norris Maddalena on behalf of Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C. (Maddalena, Yvonne)
January 9, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601094626. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C. from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa, case number 63-cv-2018-901384., filed by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(PSM). (Williams, Ronald) Modified on 1/9/2019 (TLM, ).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/9/2019. (PSM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C. from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa, case number 63-cv-2018-901384., filed by Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC, Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Dentures Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Marcel L Debruge
Represented By: Ronald D. Scott Williams
Represented By: Meghan N Cox
Represented By: Yvonne Norris Maddalena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Dentures-Tuscaloosa P.C.
Represented By: Marcel L Debruge
Represented By: Ronald D. Scott Williams
Represented By: Meghan N Cox
Represented By: Yvonne Norris Maddalena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis R Smith
Represented By: Bobby H Cockrell, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan David Townsend
Represented By: Gregory Scotch Ritchey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?