Hester v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Robin Hester
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv00052
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America.(Murphy, Grace)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Response due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 2/4/2019. (TLM2)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/1/2019. (PSM)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Riopka, Ashlee)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Riopka, Ashlee)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Guardian Life Insurance Company of America mailed certified mail (TLM, )
January 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601094635. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, filed by Robin Hester.(PSM). (Blocker, Ariel) Modified on 1/10/2019 (TLM, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Robin Hester. (Blocker, Ariel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, filed by Robin Hester.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: Ashlee Dee Riopka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hester
Represented By: David P Martin
Represented By: Ariel S Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?