Government Employees Insurance Company v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv00053
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Lift Stay. Because the government shutdown has ended, the stay entered in this action is LIFTED. If another government shutdown occurs within the next sixty (60) days, the stay will automatically be reinstated. Upon the government reopening, that stay will be lifted. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on January 29, 2019. (EBV)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Lift Stay re #3 MOTION to Stay by United States of America. (Hood, Jack)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for a Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. #3 Defendant's motion is GRANTED. As soon as funding to the Department of Justice has been restored, the stay will be lifted. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/22/2019. (PSM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay by United States of America. (Hood, Jack)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America del to plaintiff. (TLM, )
January 10, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601094636 (TLM, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Tyler Lancaster Lofton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?