Banks v. Greensboro, Alabama, City of et al

Plaintiff: Sarah Banks
Defendant: Aaron Dudley Evans, Sr and Greensboro, Alabama, City of
Case Number: 7:2019cv00072
Filed: January 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER The Plaintiff has informed the Court that she has filed the same case in the Southern District of Alabama where venue is proper. (See #4 )Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED, and costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/24/2019. (PSM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to re #3 Order to Show Cause as to Why Venue is Appropriate in the Northern District filed by Sarah Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- complaint filed in Southern Division)(Gill, Patricia)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause as to why venue is proper in the Northern District of Alabama. Plaintiff's submission should not exceed five (5) double-spaced pages and is due seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/15/2019. (PSM)
January 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601094768. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Aaron "Dudley" Evans, SR, Greensboro, Alabama, City of, filed by Sarah Banks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(PSM). (Gill, Patricia) Modified on 1/15/2019 (TLM, ).
January 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sarah Banks. (PSM)
January 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron "Dudley" Evans, SR, Greensboro, Alabama, City of, filed by Sarah Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Greensboro, Alabama, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Dudley Evans, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greensboro, Alabama, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Banks
Represented By: Julie Lynn Love
Represented By: Patricia A Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?