Davis v. Strong
Plaintiff: Roland Davis
Defendant: Darren Strong
Case Number: 7:2019cv00073
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Defendant Darren Strong filed a Suggestion of Bankruptcy #10 in this action on March 4, 2019. Plaintiff's claims against Darren Strong are hereby STAYED for a period of sixty (60) days for Plaintiff to obtain relief from the stay. If Plaintiff fails to obtain such relief, Plaintiff's claims against Darren Strong will be automatically dismissed without prejudice at the expiration of sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/6/2019. (PSM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Darren Strong. filed by Darren Strong (Spence, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Darren Strong, filed by Roland Davis.(McCants, Terrell)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Before this Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. #5 Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause as to why this motion should not be granted. Plaintiff's submission should not exceed five (5) double-spaced pages and is due eleven (11) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/21/2019. (PSM)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/20/2019. (PSM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Darren Strong.(Spence, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Darren Strong. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Spence, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis R Wisdom on behalf of Darren Strong (Wisdom, Travis)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roland Davis. Darren Strong served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (TLM, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Roland Davis. (McCants, Terrell)
January 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601094805 related document #1 COMPLAINT against Darren Strong, filed by Roland Davis.(PSM). (McCants, Terrell) Modified on 1/17/2019 (TLM, ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darren Strong, filed by Roland Davis.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Davis
Represented By: Terrell E McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Strong
Represented By: Travis R Wisdom
Represented By: Robert M Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?