Gibson v. Tuscaloosa City Schools

Plaintiff: Brenda Gibson
Defendant: Tuscaloosa City Schools
Case Number: 7:2019cv00096
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/22/2019. (PSM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint submitted by Tuscaloosa City Schools.(Ryan, William)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brenda Gibson. Tuscaloosa City Schools served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (TLM, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tuscaloosa City Schools mailed by certified mail. (TLM, )
January 21, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601094862. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Tuscaloosa City Schools, filed by Brenda Gibson.(PSM). (Fonteneau, Kira) Modified on 1/22/2019 (TLM, ).
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Brenda Gibson. (PSM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Brenda Gibson (PSM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tuscaloosa City Schools, filed by Brenda Gibson.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Tuscaloosa City Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuscaloosa City Schools
Represented By: William David Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gibson
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?