Hy-Tech Diode LLC v. Lumileds Holding BV et al
Plaintiff: Hy-Tech Diode LLC
Defendant: Lumileds Malaysioa SDB. BHD, Lumileds Holding BV and Lumileds Malaysia SBN. BHD
Case Number: 7:2019cv00116
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 2/27/2019. (TLM2)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 2/27/2019. (TLM2)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 2/27/2019. (TLM2)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 2/27/2019. (TLM2)
February 21, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $200.00, receipt number B4601095556 (TLM, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lumileds Holding BV, Lumileds Malaysia SBN. BHD. del to plaintiff pursuant to Hauge Act (TLM, )
February 7, 2019 Filing fee received from Edward K Wood in the amount of $400.00, receipt_number 1126-3274131; USDC receipt number B4601095281; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lumileds Holding BV, Lumileds Malaysioa SDB. BHD, filed by Hy-Tech Diode LLC.(PSM). (Wood, Edward) Modified on 2/8/2019 (KWC)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aaron Bradford by Hy-Tech Diode LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wood, Edward)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cindy Pham by Hy-Tech Diode LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wood, Edward)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex Ruge by Hy-Tech Diode LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wood, Edward)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Brunelli by Hy-Tech Diode LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Wood, Edward)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hy-Tech Diode LLC. filed by Hy-Tech Diode LLC (Wood, Edward)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hy-Tech Diode LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Supplement Summons - Lumiled Malaysia, #5 Supplement Summons - Lumileds Holding, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Edward)
January 18, 2019 Request for service by certified mail filed by Hy-Tech Diode LLC as stated in complaint #1 . (PSM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lumileds Holding BV, Lumileds Malaysioa SDB. BHD, filed by Hy-Tech Diode LLC.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hy-Tech Diode LLC v. Lumileds Holding BV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumileds Malaysioa SDB. BHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumileds Holding BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumileds Malaysia SBN. BHD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hy-Tech Diode LLC
Represented By: Edward K Wood, Jr
Represented By: Cindy N. Pham
Represented By: Alex W Ruge
Represented By: Aaron P. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?