Stripling v. Tomson et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Justin Stripling
Defendant: Warden Tomson, C.O. Cutts, Jr., Bibb County Correctional Facility and Cpt. Hudden
Case Number: 7:2019cv00239
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Western Office
0 Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
1 Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/21/2019. (TLM, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Justin Stripling re #8 Order (Attachments: #1 order doc #8 , #2 Supplement)(KWC)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/20/2019. (TLM, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00030. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 8, 2019 Case transferred electronically to USDC, Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: (1) The magistrate judge's recommendation (doc. no. #5 ) is adopted. (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama.The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/8/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]
February 5, 2019 NO OBJECTIONS filed to #5 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/11/2019. (dmn, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/11/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Justin Stripling. (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Justin Stripling. (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Bibb County Correctional Facility, C.O. Cutts, Jr, Cpt. Hudden, Warden Tomson, filed by Justin Stripling.(es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 2/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stripling v. Tomson et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Tomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Cutts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibb County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Hudden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Stripling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?