Weaver v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The

Plaintiff: Lora Weaver
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 7:2019cv00514
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/21/2019. (PSM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Walters, Jason)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.(Walters, Jason)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A Walters on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Walters, Jason)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. mailed certified mail (TLM, )
April 2, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601096463. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The, filed by Lora Weaver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PSM). (Martin, David) Modified on 4/2/2019 (TLM, ).
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lora Weaver. (Martin, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The, filed by Lora Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Weaver
Represented By: David P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?