Mack v. Foremost Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Roosevelt Mack
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00708
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to remand #5 Defendant has notified the Court that it does not oppose the motion. #6 Therefore, Plaintiff's motion to remand #5 is GRANTED, and this case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Greene County, Alabama. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/29/2019. (PSM)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to re #5 NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND filed by Foremost Insurance Company. (Still, Stephen)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 5/31/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code 3967498 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Roosevelt Mack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Stapp, Kevin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answers to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for Admissions by Roosevelt Mack. (Stapp, Kevin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foremost Insurance Company. filed by Foremost Insurance Company (Still, Stephen)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/9/2019. (PSM)
May 9, 2019 Filing Fee received from Stephen W Still Jr, in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3342740; USDC receipt number B4601097540; related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foremost Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Greene County, case number 35-cv-2019-900013., filed by Foremost Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(PSM). (Still, Stephen) Modified on 5/9/2019 (KWC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Foremost Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Greene County, case number 35-cv-2019-900013., filed by Foremost Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Foremost Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Mack
Represented By: Kevin Scott Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen W Still, Jr
Represented By: Reed R Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?