Swearingen et al v. Juul Labs Inc et al
Plaintiff: John Thomas Via Peavy and Elizabeth Ann Swearingen
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc and Phillip Morris USA Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00779
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Swearingen's claims without prejudice. #7 . Accordingly, the claims of Plaintiff Elizabeth Ann Swearingen are dismissed without prejudice. The claims of Plaintiff John Thomas Via Peavy remain pending. Defendants Motion to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline and Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer or Stay #13 is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint #8 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. The parties' Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule #18 is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Plaintiffs have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to respond to Defendant Juul Labs Inc's Motion to Transfer or to Stay #12 . Plaintiffs' response shall not exceed thirty (30) double-spaced pages. Defendants will thereafter have seven (7) days to file a reply, Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/15/2019. (PSM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Juul Labs Inc. (Olson, Lana)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Jane McCrary on behalf of Altria Group Inc, Phillip Morris USA Inc. (McCrary, Lisa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altria Group Inc. filed by Altria Group Inc (Barze, R)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillip Morris USA Inc.. filed by Phillip Morris USA Inc. (Barze, R)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Joinder In Defendant Juul Labs, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer or Stay by Altria Group Inc, Phillip Morris USA Inc.. (Barze, R) Modified on 7/15/2019 (PSM).
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline and Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer or Stay by Altria Group Inc, Juul Labs Inc, Phillip Morris USA Inc.. (Olson, Lana)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer or to Stay by Juul Labs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danna McKay, #2 Declaration of Lana Olson, #3 Olson Declaration Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #4 Olson Declaration Exhibit 1 (Part 2), #5 Olson Declaration Exhibit 1 (Part 3), #6 Olson Declaration Exhibit 1 (Part 4), #7 Olson Declaration Exhibit 1 (Part 5), #8 Olson Declaration Exhibit 1 (Part 6), #9 Olson Declaration Exhibit 2, #10 Olson Declaration Exhibit 3, #11 Olson Declaration Exhibit 4, #12 Olson Declaration Exhibit 5, #13 Olson Declaration Exhibit 6, #14 Olson Declaration Exhibit 7)(Olson, Lana)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/20/2019. (PSM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs Inc. filed by Juul Labs Inc (Doss, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Doss on behalf of Juul Labs Inc (Doss, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Altria Group Inc, Juul Labs Inc, Phillip Morris USA Inc.. (Olson, Lana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elizabeth Ann Swearingen (Terrell, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Thomas Via Peavy, Elizabeth Ann Swearingen. Phillip Morris USA Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Methvin, R)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Thomas Via Peavy, Elizabeth Ann Swearingen. Altria Group Inc served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Methvin, R)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Thomas Via Peavy, Elizabeth Ann Swearingen. Juul Labs Inc served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Methvin, R)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Altria Group Inc, Juul Labs Inc, Phillip Morris USA Inc.- returned to pla for service. (KWC)
May 24, 2019 Filing Fee received from R G Methvin in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3353865; USDC receipt number B4601097934; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Altria Group Inc, Juul Labs Inc, Phillip Morris USA Inc., filed by John Thomas Via Peavy, Elizabeth Ann Swearingen.(PSM). (Methvin, R) Modified on 5/24/2019 (KWC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina D Crow on behalf of Elizabeth Ann Swearingen, John Thomas Via Peavy (Crow, Christina)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altria Group Inc, Juul Labs Inc, Phillip Morris USA Inc., filed by John Thomas Via Peavy, Elizabeth Ann Swearingen.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swearingen et al v. Juul Labs Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Inc
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: Jeffrey P Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc
Represented By: R Bruce Barze, Jr
Represented By: Lisa Jane McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Morris USA Inc.
Represented By: R Bruce Barze, Jr
Represented By: Lisa Jane McCrary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas Via Peavy
Represented By: James M Terrell
Represented By: R G Methvin, Jr
Represented By: Patrick Clayton Marshall
Represented By: Courtney Cooper Gipson
Represented By: Christina D Crow
Represented By: David J Hodge
Represented By: Mahaley P McInnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Swearingen
Represented By: James M Terrell
Represented By: R G Methvin, Jr
Represented By: Patrick Clayton Marshall
Represented By: Courtney Cooper Gipson
Represented By: Christina D Crow
Represented By: David J Hodge
Represented By: Mahaley P McInnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?