Huang v. Board of Immigration
Petitioner: Wei Qin Huang and Weiqin Huang
Respondent: Board of Immigration
Case Number: 7:2019cv00857
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to re #7 filed by Board of Immigration. (Wilson, Sarah)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Mail (order doc #7 ) Returned as Undeliverable; RETURN TO SENDER; REFUSED. Mail sent to Weiqin Huang. (KWC)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER On June 25, 2019, the respondent was ordered to appear and show cause in writing within twenty-one days why the relief requested by the petitioner should not be granted. #5 . Now pending before the court is the respondent's motion for extension of time to respond. #6 . The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the respondent shall have up to and including July 30, 2019, to respond to the order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/17/2019. (PSM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Order to Show Cause,, by Board of Immigration. (Wilson, Sarah)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE This is an action on a petition for writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Wei Qin Huang. Petitioner challenges the legality of her continued detention by federal immigration authorities pending her removal from the United States under the Immigration and Nationality Act, 8 U.S.C. 1101 et seq. (See #1 ). See also generally Zadvydas v. Davis, 533 U.S. 678 (2001). Petitioner has paid the filing fee.It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order why the relief requested by petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/25/2019. (PSM)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601098600. (JLC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Mail (ORDER doc #2 ) Returned as Undeliverable; NO REGISTER NUMBER. Mail sent to WeiQin Huang. (KWC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Mail (notice of case filing) Returned as Undeliverable; NO REGISTER NUMBER. Mail sent to WeiQin Huang. (KWC)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING The petition in this matter is deficient for the reason indicated within. The petitioner is ORDERED to correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(PSM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Wei Qin Huang.(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Board of Immigration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Immigration
Represented By: Sarah Stevens Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wei Qin Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Weiqin Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?