Terry v. Harris
Plaintiff: Christopher Terry
Defendant: Arthur Harris
Case Number: 7:2019cv01074
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Western Office
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The full payment provision of the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) does not apply to a civil detainee because he is not considered a prisoner within the meaning of the PLRA. See Troville v. Venz, 303 F.3d 1256, 1260 (11th Cir. 2002). Accordingly, the plaintiff is not obligated to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 and his motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 7/26/2019. (KEK)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00203. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as the opinion of this Court. It is ORDERED that this action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/10/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Judge DuBose. (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 7/10/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Terry. It is recommended, in the interest of justice, that Plaintiff's action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 06/14/2019. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 7/10/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Terry - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU). (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 7/10/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 1983 COMPLAINT against Arthur Harris, filed by Christopher Terry - Ref to MJ/Bivins (PSU) (nah) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?