Grissom v. Wiggins et al
Plaintiff: Mark Grissom
Defendant: Mr Jay Moyer, Ms Stephanie Wallace, Ms Leslie Wiggins, Mr John F Merkle, Ms Tonya Gibson, Mr Amir Farooqi, Ms Maria Andrews and Mr Bryant Lewis
Case Number: 7:2019cv01085
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before 09/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 08/30/2019. (RCP)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Leslie Wiggins. (Wilson, Sarah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Orders Docs 7 and 14, MOTION for Default, MOTION to Compel by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Disqualify Agency Defendant From Client Attorney Privilege -Deemed filed 8/20/19 by Mark Grissom. (MRR, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 (MRR, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to allow all VA Whistle Blowers the right to provide evidence and testimony -Deemed filed 8/20/19 by Mark Grissom. (MRR, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 (MRR, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Establish Agency Intent and Point of Contact and or Defendant Communications and Summons Response-Deemed filed 8/20/19 by Mark Grissom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MRR, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 (MRR, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Amending Complaint and Reconsideration by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Amending Complaint and Reconsideration by Mark Grissom. (MRR, ) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (MRR, ).
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for the Court to Require by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Approve Media Release by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Witness Special Protection, Court Approved Statement of Protections with Consideration to the Risks Whistle Blowers Assume, Consideration and Guidance on Allowing a Period of Immunity for Whistle Blowing, and Request for Special Guidance on Issues of Considerable Public Impact by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER- The properly served defts have yet to make any filing; It is ORDERED that, on or before September 4, 2019, Pltf shall show cause, if any exists, as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/22/19. (MRR, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel The Department of Veterans Affairs to Allow Full and Unimpeded Access to OAWP Records, Staff, Systems, and Other Resources to Properly Evaluate and Independently Investigate Whistle Blower Retaliation and Other Issues by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Have Agency and Government Pay for Plaintiff Legal Fees and Retain Defendants As Listed In the Complaint by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Deny Agency Representation by Mark Grissom. (KEK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Leslie Wiggins served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jay Moyer served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Stephanie Wallace served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (MRR, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Amir Farooqi served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Tonya Gibson served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Bryant Lewis served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; John F Merkle served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (MRR, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to add defendants; plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/19/2019. (KAM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to add defendants by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amir Farooqi, Tonya Gibson, Bryant Lewis, John F Merkle, Jay Moyer, Stephanie Wallace, Leslie Wiggins, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, Doc 2. Mail sent to Mark Grissom (MRR, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Mark Grissom. (MRR, )
July 17, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601099189 (MRR, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Grissom.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grissom v. Wiggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Jay Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Stephanie Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Leslie Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr John F Merkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Tonya Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Amir Farooqi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Maria Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Bryant Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?