Lee v. Bradley
Petitioner: Yong Cha Lee
Respondent: Patrica Bradley
Case Number: 7:2019cv01306
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/4/2019. (SRD)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The petitioner shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments she may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/1/2019. (SRD)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to re #3 Order to Show Cause dated August 30, 2019 filed by Patrica Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Cheek, Jason)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Order, dated August 30, 2019 by Patrica Bradley. (Cheek, Jason)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of Patrica Bradley (Cheek, Jason)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/30/2019. (SRD)
August 30, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601100224. (JLC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. If Petitioner fails to correct the deficient pleading in compliance with this notice within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this notice, the court will dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/19/2019. (SRD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Yong Cha Lee.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yong Cha Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrica Bradley
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?