Doe v. Poe et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Deborah Johnson, Gilbert Jean, JC Poe, Jr, Dr Marcus O'Mary, Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation and Roger Wilson
Case Number: 7:2019cv01314
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Speagle, Scott) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (MRR, ).
October 3, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allen, Andrew) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (MRR, ).
October 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden: Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2019. (BST, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 31 Dr. Marcus O'Mary, Roger Wilson and Gilbert Jean's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roger Wilson.(Donahue, Timothy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 30 J.C. Poe, Jr., and Deborah Johnson's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JC Poe, Jr.(Donahue, Timothy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled for 10:15 AM on Wednesday, October 2, 2019; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled (ASL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #26 Motion to Require Jane Doe #3 to Reveal Her Identity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/23/2019. (KMAW)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation re #26 MOTION AMICS MOTION TO REQUIRE JANE DOE #3 TO REVEAL HER IDENTITY Notice of Withdrawal (Speagle, Scott)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION AMICS MOTION TO REQUIRE JANE DOE #3 TO REVEAL HER IDENTITY by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Speagle, Scott) Modified- Filed in the wrong case in error- on 9/23/2019 (MRR, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Proceed Anonymously Out of Time filed by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Speagle, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 4, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after November 4, 2019. A telephone status conference is SET for 10:15 a.m. onWednesday, October 2, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to dial 888-636-3807 no less than five minutes before the status conference begins. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if all parties submit forms 24 hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/19/2019. (KEK)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly S DeShazo on behalf of Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation (DeShazo, Kimberly)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Before the court is the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. Doc. 21. It is ORDERED that on or before October 3, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion (Doc. 21), and Defendant shall file a reply on or before October 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/19/2019. (KMAW)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Speagle, Scott)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 ***Document Sealed pursuant to Text Order 16 (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (MRR, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Proceed Anonymously filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Allen, Andrew) Modified on 9/6/2019 (MRR, ).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/5/2019. (KMAW)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Proceed Anonymously Out of Time by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Allen, Andrew)
September 5, 2019 REMOVED DOC 16 - MOTION re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Allen, Andrew) -Filing errors (MRR, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Sworn Declaration under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/5/2019. (KMAW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File SWORN DECLARATIONS UNDER SEAL by Jane Doe. (Allen, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two)(Speagle, Scott)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (MRR, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gilbert Jean served (no date on green card) (MRR, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Deborah Johnson served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; Marcus O'Mary served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; JC Poe, Jr served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (MRR, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Roger Wilson served (no date on greed card) (MRR, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- Regarding Pltf's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously (Doc #2 ); The court requires additional briefing to determine if the pltf should be permitted to proceed anonymously Doe v. Frank, 951 F.2d 320, 324 (11th Cir. 1992); On or before September 4, 2019, pltf is ORDERED to file additional briefing on the legal authority for her motion and the application of that authority to the facts presented here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/21/19. (MRR, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jane Doe. (Allen, Andrew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ***Document Sealed pursuant to Order, Doc 5 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration) (MRR, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 8/15/2019. (KMAW)
August 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412674 (b4601099887). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 1, # 2 2, # 3 3, # 4 4, # 5 5)(MRR, ). (Allen, Andrew) Modified on 8/15/2019 (MRR, ).
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Document #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously Motion for Leave to File Sworn Declarations Under Seal by Jane Doe. (Allen, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously by Jane Doe. (MRR, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Poe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Michele Elaine Pate
Represented By: James Franklin Ozment
Represented By: Andrew C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Johnson
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Jean
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Poe, Jr
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Marcus O'Mary
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Municipal Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Scott M Speagle
Represented By: Kimberly S DeShazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wilson
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?