Marshall v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Phillip N Marshall
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv01490
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Tindal, Clay)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/15/2019. (PSM)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Tindal, Clay)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Tindal, Clay)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Phillip N Marshall. (Cockrell, Bobby)
September 6, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3429309 (ALND B4601100454) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Phillip N Marshall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(KEK). (Cockrell, Bobby) Modified on 9/6/2019 (KEK).
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Phillip N Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Clay A Tindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip N Marshall
Represented By: Bobby H Cockrell, Jr
Represented By: Jonathan David Townsend
Represented By: Gregory Scotch Ritchey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?