Farley v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Johnny R Farley
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Kelvin L Davis
Case Number: 7:2019cv01561
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2604
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Johnny R Farley.(Hampton, Nicole)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Before the Court is Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion forMore Definite Statement #9 . The motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide a more definite statement by amending his complaint no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/4/2019. (PSM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Manley, Reid)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Manley, Reid)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to Kelvin L Davis delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 10/17/2019. (BJB)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/15/2019. (PSM)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Rummage, Ryan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Johnny R Farley as to Johnny R Farley. (KAM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnny R Farley. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (JLC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kelvin L Davis and Wells Fargo Bank N.A. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 24th day of September, 2019. (JLC)
September 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3440175. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Kelvin L Davis, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed by Johnny R Farley.(PSM). (Hampton, Nicole) NDAL rec# B4601100780 Modified on 9/24/2019 (KAM).
September 19, 2019 Request for service by certified mail filed by Johnny R Farley, as stated in complaint #1 . (PSM)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kelvin L Davis, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., filed by Johnny R Farley.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farley v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny R Farley
Represented By: Nicole Bohannon Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?