Town of Vance, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Town of Vance, Alabama and Vance, Alabama, Town of
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Actavis LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc, Noramco Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv01564
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL 2804: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk emailed to Clerk of Court in Northern District of Ohio. (PSM)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vance, Alabama, Town of. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (JLC)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Strubel, J)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vance, Alabama, Town of. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (JLC)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Vance, Alabama, Town of as to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (KAM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vance, Alabama, Town of. Actavis LLC served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019; Cardinal Health Inc served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Cephalon Inc served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc (no date or signature)served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Johnson & Johnson served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019; Purdue Pharma Inc (no date or signature)served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (KAM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town of Vance, Alabama. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Noramco Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; Watson Laboratories Inc served but signature and date omitted. (JLC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Town of Vance, Alabama. Actavis Pharma Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019; Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (KAM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by H Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
September 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3439170 (ALND B4601100742) related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Town of Vance, Alabama.(PSM). (Sutton, William) Modified on 9/23/2019 (KEK).
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Town of Vance, Alabama. (PSM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Town of Vance, Alabama (PSM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Town of Vance, Alabama.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Vance, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: H Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: David L Brown, Jr
Represented By: J Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Vance, Alabama
Represented By: Rhon E Jones
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Jere L Beasley
Represented By: Richard D Stratton
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance, Alabama, Town of
Represented By: Rhon E Jones
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Jere L Beasley
Represented By: Richard D Stratton
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?