Spurlin v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Charles Spurlin
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 7:2019cv01595
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Remand filed by Charles Spurlin. (Hust, Wilbor)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Remand filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Newell, Mark)
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge L Scott Coogler: Telephone Conference held on 10/7/2019. (PSM)
October 3, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call (877) 336-1828 and use Access Code: 1966344 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference.(PSM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Remand by Charles Spurlin. (Hust, Wilbor)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/30/2019. (PSM)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and COUNTERCLAIM against Charles Spurlin by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (KEK)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (KEK)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The from Circuit Court of Tuscaloosa County, Alabama, case number 63-cv-2019-901102, filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurlin v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Spurlin
Represented By: Wilbor J Hust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Sam Gaillard Ladd, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Abell Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?