McConico v Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 7:2019cv01600
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by James McConico, Jr (MRR, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Sewell, Robert)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sewell, Robert) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (MRR, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay All Motions Filed By the Defendants Until Service is Made Upon Defendant and Green Dot Bank by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Complaint by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 Exhibit) (MRR, ).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for Wednesday, 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/10/2019. (KMAW)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by James McConico, Jr, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (MRR, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Doc #1 Notice of Removal filed by James McConico, Jr. (MRR, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 21, 2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 21, 2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on November 13, 2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-636-3807 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 3676046. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/8/19. (MRR, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Pending before the court is the #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before 10/22/2019. Defendant may file a reply on or before 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/08/2019. (KMAW)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sewell, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (MRR, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Inc from Circuit Court of Bibb County, case number 07-cv-2019-000009., filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )
September 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3445166 (B4601100891). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Inc from Circuit Court of Bibb County, case number 07-cv-2019-000009., filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Sewell, Robert) Modified on 9/30/2019 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConico v Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Wesley B Gilchrist
Represented By: Robert Jackson Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?