Deerman v. SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc
Plaintiff: Jason Deerman
Defendant: SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc
Case Number: 7:2020cv00048
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2020. Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/6/2020. (PSM)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hilson, Henry)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 2/7/2020. (PSM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc. filed by SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc (Hilson, Henry)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc.(Hilson, Henry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Deerman. SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (AKD)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc mailed certified mail. (AKD)
January 13, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601103359 (AKD)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc, filed by Jason Deerman.(PSM)
January 10, 2020 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jason Deerman, as stated in complaint #1 . (PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deerman v. SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMP Automotive Systems Alabama Inc
Represented By: Henry Carlton Hilson
Represented By: Caroline Houston Page
Represented By: Ronald W Flowers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Deerman
Represented By: Katherine Furek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?