Murdock v. Omega Financial LLC
Plaintiff: John T Murdock
Defendant: Omega Financial LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv00508
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omega Financial LLC. filed by Omega Financial LLC (Baugh, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Motion to Dismiss #13 . The parties are REMINDED to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B of the courts Initial Order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/11/2020. (KAM)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/2020. (KAM)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 Brief re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) . (Baugh, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Omega Financial LLC. (Baugh, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant's Supplement to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Jason Adam Snyderman #9 . Because Attorney Snyderman has met all the conditions for admission pro hac vice, the Motion #9 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/28/2020. (KEK)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendant's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 , filed on behalf of Attorney Huaou Yan. Defendant's Motion #10 is GRANTED. Attorney Yan is accordingly granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/28/2020. (KEK)
May 28, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3598491 (ALND receipt# B4601106174). (Baugh, Robert) Modified on 5/28/2020 (AKD).
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Huaou Yan by Omega Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of PA)(Baugh, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason A. Snyderman by Omega Financial LLC. (Baugh, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, filed on behalf of Attorney Jason Adam Snyderman #7 . For good cause shown, the Motion #7 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. On or before May 29, 2020, Attorney Snyderman SHALL certify to the court that he has read and understands (1) any local rules applicable in this District; (2) this court's CM/ECF requirements; and (3) the Alabama State Bar Pledge of Professionalism which can be accessed at http://www.alabar.org/service/Pledge.cfm. Failure to comply with this order will result in vacatur of the conditional grant of the motion. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/28/2020. (KAM)
May 27, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3597229. (Baugh, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason A. Snyderman by Omega Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Baugh, Robert)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Salvati Cole on behalf of Omega Financial LLC (Cole, Meghan)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Richardson Baugh on behalf of Omega Financial LLC (Baugh, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John T Murdock. Omega Financial LLC served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (KAM)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Omega Financial LLC. mailed certified mail (KAM)
April 15, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3573843, NDAL receipt #B4601105422.(Green, Wilson) Modified on 4/16/2020 (JLC).
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by John T Murdock. (KAM)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Omega Financial LLC, filed by John T Murdock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murdock v. Omega Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T Murdock
Represented By: Wilson F Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?