Murphy v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Hunter Reed Murphy
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 7:2020cv00530
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration, Commissioner answer due 7/29/2020 (MRR, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hunter Reed Murphy. All Defendants. (Turner, Richard)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, returned to pltf in SASE envelope for service (MRR, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days from the entry date of this notice. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (MRR, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Hunter Reed Murphy. (MRR, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Filing fee $ 400 B4601105483.), filed by Hunter Reed Murphy.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Reed Murphy
Represented By: Richard D Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?