Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC v. United Mine Workers of America et al
Plaintiff: Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC
Defendant: Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America and District 20 United Mine Workers of America
Case Number: 7:2020cv00648
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court acknowledges the parties joint proposed litigation plan #14 and hereby adopts the dates set forth within the filing #14 . Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/30/2020. (PSM)
June 30, 2020 NOTICE: The telephone conference scheduled for TODAY 6/30/2020 at 10:00 AM is hereby CANCELLED. (PSM)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Davies, George)
June 26, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge L Scott Coogler. Counsel are to call 877-336-1828 and use Access Code 1966344 five (5) minutes prior to the start of the conference. (PSM)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/22/2020. (PSM)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC.(Scully, Matthew)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission and granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 6/4/2020. (LAS2)
June 3, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3602721 (ALND receipt # B4601106327). (Davies, George) Modified on 6/3/2020 (AKD).
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission of Kevin F. Fagan by District 20 United Mine Workers of America, Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement)(Davies, George)
June 3, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3602717 (ALND Receipt# B4601106326). (Davies, George) Modified on 6/3/2020 (AKD).
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission by District 20 United Mine Workers of America, Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement)(Davies, George)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC. United Mine Workers of America served on 5/28/2020, answer due 6/18/2020. (KEK)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC by Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America, District 20 United Mine Workers of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Davies, George)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George N Davies on behalf of District 20 United Mine Workers of America, Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America (Davies, George)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC. District 20 United Mine Workers of America served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (KAM)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to District 20 United Mine Workers of America, Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America mailed certified mail (KAM)
May 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3587581. related document #1 COMPLAINT against District 20 United Mine Workers of America, Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America, filed by Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC.(PSM). (Metheny, K)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC. (PSM)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC (PSM)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against District 20 United Mine Workers of America, Bradley Nix, United Mine Workers of America, filed by Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC v. United Mine Workers of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warrior Met Coal Mining LLC
Represented By: K Bryance Metheny
Represented By: Matthew T Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Nix
Represented By: Kevin F Fagan
Represented By: George N Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Mine Workers of America
Represented By: Kevin F Fagan
Represented By: George N Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District 20 United Mine Workers of America
Represented By: Kevin F Fagan
Represented By: George N Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?