Brown v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Kimberly L Brown
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 7:2020cv00682
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly L Brown. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 6/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (KAM)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 5/15/2020. (KMAW)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
May 14, 2020 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days from the entry date of this notice. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (MRR, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kimberly L Brown. (MRR, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Kimberly L Brown.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly L Brown
Represented By: Monica H Grecu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?