Westbrook v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Westbrook
Defendant: CR Bard Inc and Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Case Number: 7:2020cv00724
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 7/8/2020. (LAS2)
July 8, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3625609 (ALND receipt# B4601107031). (Morris, George) Modified on 7/9/2020 (AKD).
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/22/2020. (PSM)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Maughan, Diane)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc.(Maughan, Diane)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Westbrook. (VanDerVeer, Nathan)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Westbrook. Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (VanDerVeer, Nathan)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Westbrook. CR Bard Inc served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (VanDerVeer, Nathan)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 6/2/2020. (LAS2)
June 2, 2020 PHV Fee paid for Jessica Glitz in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3601120, NDAL receipt #B4601106284. (VanDerVeer, Nathan) Modified on 6/2/2020 (JLC).
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica Glitz by Patricia Westbrook. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cert of Good Standing 1, #2 Supplement Cert of Good Standing 2, #3 Supplement Cert of Good Standing 3)(VanDerVeer, Nathan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc and CR Bard Inc delivered to plaintiff for service. (AKD)
May 22, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3595548, NDAL receipt #B4601106096.(VanDerVeer, Nathan) Modified on 5/22/2020 (JLC).
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, filed by Patricia Westbrook.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westbrook v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Westbrook
Represented By: Nathan C VanDerVeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?